POMEGRANATE OPPORTUNITIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty of Queen Katharine Academy students who are in need because of financial hardship or other disadvantage by providing grants, items and services to those in need and / or to charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty and / or financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 29 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kaye Sheldon | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Ayres | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Anderson | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Fielding | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Scott | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Hodgson | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Kirby | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.08k | £2.60k | £7.79k | £4.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.90k | £724 | £8.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF QUEEN KATHARINE ACADEMY STUDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO THOSE IN NEED AND/OR TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND/OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O QUEEN KATHARINE ACADEMY
MOUNTSTEVEN AVENUE
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 6HX
- Phone:
- 01733383888
- Email:
- tombaldwin1756@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window