CALVARY HARVEST MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, prevention and relief of poverty and advancing Christian religious activities, practices and beliefs by helping other charitable or voluntary bodies and the general public/mankind for the public benefit throughout Wales and in Zimbabwe by making grants to individuals and organisations and providing other finances as the need requires
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout Wales
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 25 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PHILLIMON BANDA | Chair | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lainah Linda Banda | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON JENNINGS | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105 | £200 | £0 | £560 | £855 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £530 | £820 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 14 March 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN WALES AND ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, PROVIDING PASTORAL CARE AND CARRYING OUT MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Cae Newydd Close
CARDIFF
CF5 4TS
- Phone:
- 07947871063
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window