Accounts and annual returns CLUB AUSOME

Charity number: 1187683
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 14 April 2025 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 14 April 2025 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 04 June 2024 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 04 June 2024 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 04 June 2024 489 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 04 June 2024 489 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 09 February 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 12 March 2022 39 days late Download Open in new window