Accounts and annual returns BOURNVILLE BOOKFEST

Charity number: 1185157
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2022 17 September 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 17 September 2023 17 days late
Annual return 31 October 2021 20 September 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 20 September 2022 20 days late
Annual return 31 October 2020 18 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 18 August 2021 On Time