Financial history THE MAY PRICE SRN AWARD

Charity number: 514578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £444 £287 £96 £790 £1.99k
Total expenditure £250 £200 £150 £220 £750
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A