ASPLEY GUISE VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall Management Committee oversees the running of the Aspley Guise Village Hall for the benefit of local residents and community support organisations. These include the WI, Cubs, Age UK Day Care and a mother & toddler playgroup, leisure activities including children and adult dance classes, amateur dramatic productions, choir rehearsals, various arts and local interest societies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 13 January 2020: CIO registration
- 20 March 2024: Funds received from 270334 ASPLEY GUISE VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BARBER | Chair | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Broadbent | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Fraser William Pearson | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lindsay | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Molly Fitzgerald | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JIM HUTTON | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Scott | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Macmillan | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Neale | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gill Cockle | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE PAPWORTH | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Skelton | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £31.52k | £26.33k | £25.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £35.39k | £37.53k | £25.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.01k | £3.43k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ASPLEY GUISE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF BEDFORDSHIRE AND BUCKINGHAMSHIRE WITH NO DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASPLEY GUISE VILLAGE HALL
9 WOBURN LANE
ASPLEY GUISE
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 8JH
- Phone:
- 01908584456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window