FAITH IN LATER LIFE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Providing resources and information regarding different aspects of older age to equip Christians and churches to better serve older people. This is predominantly provided via the website. - The website also hosts a national directory of church run activities for older people in the wider community to attend. E.g. A lunch club. - Being a Christian voice for older people, across Society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Hammersley CBE | Chair | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wileman BEM MA BA | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence Puttick | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE MARGARET COBB | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.75k | £107.54k | £156.89k | £185.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.43k | £117.99k | £103.30k | £183.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY INSPIRING AND EQUIPPING CHRISTIANS AND CHURCHES TO SERVE AND EQUIP OLDER PEOPLE IN THEIR CHRISTIAN SERVICE, AND TO WORK EFFECTIVELY WITH OLDER PEOPLE IN COMMUNITIES EVERYWHERE, AND TO BRING OLDER PEOPLE INTO CHRISTIAN FAITH AND COMMUNITY, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAITH IN LATER LIFE
175 TOWER BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 2AL
- Phone:
- 03003038405
- Email:
- info@faithinlaterlife.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window