UNIVERSAL GOD: MESSAGE OF PEACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Peace and Harmony between people of different religions and background through educating about the common shared concepts of Faith in a Universal God, Peace, Love, Honesty, Integrity, Compassion, Kindness, Respect, Justice, Gratitude, Forgiveness, Humility, and Patience while providing a platform and opportunities for our community to help one another through creativity and sharing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Lale Tuncer | Chair | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lee Weissman | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Meagher | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.45k | £45.59k | £13.74k | £2.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.61k | £34.26k | £9.48k | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £27.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Montague Walk
SHREWSBURY
SY3 8GG
- Phone:
- 07933571872
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window