Accounts and annual returns VOLUNTARY ACTION HINCKLEY & BOSWORTH

Charity number: 514589
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 01 October 2008 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 06 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 September 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 05 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 05 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 23 February 2005 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 23 February 2005 23 days late