THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF AYLSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC is committed to enabling as many people as possible to worship at our church and be part of the parish community. It is primarily focussed on the advancement of religion, which is recognised as a charitable purpose having public benefit. All regular public worship is provided free of charge, is not restricted to Church of England adherents, and is available and open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 August 2019: Standard registration
- AYLSHAM PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
- AYLSHAM PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Engelsen | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clair Hartigan | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Bolton | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Graver | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Roger Martin | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Bond | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hildrew | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
The Rev Canon Julie Boyd | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MARTIN | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Deborah Graver | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Tibbitt | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Henry Macey | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.66k | £192.51k | £160.54k | £164.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.01k | £154.35k | £166.08k | £210.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Market Place
Aylsham
NR11 6EH
- Phone:
- 01263704457
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window