Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF AYLSHAM
Charity number: 1185005

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Engelsen | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clair Hartigan | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Bolton | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Graver | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Roger Martin | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Bond | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hildrew | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
The Rev Canon Julie Boyd | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MARTIN | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Deborah Graver | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Tibbitt | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Henry Macey | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.