WAKEFIELD STREET KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help homeless and less fortunate members of our society by holding a street kitchen in Wakefield each Wednesday evening. We also help meet any pressing needs at any other time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 August 2023
Total income includes £10,075 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 09 August 2019: Standard registration
- 05 May 2023: Funds received from 1160107 TRJFP CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Howard | Chair | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Allen | Trustee | 25 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Smith | Trustee | 25 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Anthony Hurdus-Warren | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Joseph Peter Keighley | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Stephenson | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Howard | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sam Steele | Trustee | 09 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/08/2020 | 08/08/2021 | 08/08/2022 | 08/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.26k | £52.90k | £61.79k | £60.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.01k | £52.15k | £63.46k | £66.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £622 | £11.45k | £18.00k | £10.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN WAKEFIELD (AND SURROUNDING AREA) BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING AND OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS TO THE HOMELESS OR THOSE IN POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1
RCM Business Centre
Sandbeds Trading Estate
OSSETT
West Yorkshire
WF5 9ND
- Phone:
- 07926138180
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window