MAYOR OF GOSPORT'S CHARITY APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds are raised by the Mayor of Gosport during his/her year in office. The Mayor will nominate individuals, charities and voluntary organisations in the Gosport and surrounding area that will benefit from their fundraising at the start of the municipal year. At the end of the municipal year, the Mayor will determine the proportion of available funds to be given to each nomination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 December 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Casey Elizabeth Wheeler | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John William Beavis MBE | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Bradley | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Hook | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Earle | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Young | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.99k | £6.18k | £5.76k | £6.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.76k | £6.18k | £5.76k | £6.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 June 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF GOSPORT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS, CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOSPORT BOROUGH COUNCIL
TOWN HALL
HIGH STREET
GOSPORT
PO12 1EB
- Phone:
- 02392545202
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window