ALPRAHAM AND CALVELEY READING ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the general benefit of the residents of Alpraham, Calveley and the surrounding community to establish or secure the establishment of a new village hall, using funds raised from sale of the old (circa 1890) hall. Of an equipped village hall for recreation and other leisure-time occupation in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving the wellbeing for all persons for who
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 01 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard LLoyd Chairman | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret Gregory | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Lloyd-Jones | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Waterhouse | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Maclennan | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joy Konieczny | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Faulkner | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.44k | £177 | £340 | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £810 | £534 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALPRAHAM, CALVELEY AND THE SURROUNDING COMMUNITY FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ALPRAHAM, CALVELEY AND THE SURROUNDING COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alpraham and Calveley Village Hall
1 Tollemache Way
Alpraham
TARPORLEY
Cheshire
CW6 9YS
- Phone:
- 01829260756
- Email:
- acvh.info@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window