THE MAGGIE OLIVER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Maggie Oliver Foundation supports adult survivors of sexual abuse transform their Pain into Power. It provides legal advocacy and emotional support for survivors nationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Oliver | Chair | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Alan Bickerton | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gilbey-Smith | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Simon Rodgers | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lynn Sahota | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ellis | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Pennington | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Ormiston | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.14k | £94.05k | £236.94k | £191.79k | £265.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.49k | £49.54k | £152.55k | £200.68k | £273.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND BACKGROUNDS WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM SEXUAL ABUSE BY MAKING HELP, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTION AVAILABLE WHEN NEEDED TO ASSIST THEIR RECOVERY AND MOVING FORWARD IN THEIR LIVES; AND TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AMONGST PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND BACKGROUNDS THROUGHOUT THE UK WHO ARE AT RISK OF SEXUAL ABUSE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION PROGRAMMES AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pannone Corporate Llp
378-380 Deansgate
MANCHESTER
M3 4LY
- Phone:
- 0800 131 3355
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window