INSULATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Insulate distributes sleeping bags, rucksacks, and other items to London's homeless over the winter period
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Stevens | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caleb Wheeler-Robinson | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Stockwell | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Krishnamurthy Spencer | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1074 days | |
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PERSONS, OR THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS, IN LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF SLEEPING BAGS, OTHER BASIC SURVIVAL ITEMS, ADVICE, SIGNPOSTING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Hornsey Road
LONDON
N7 6DJ
- Phone:
- 07791040595
- Email:
- bolistevens@gmail.com
- Website:
-
insulatelondon.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window