HULL KURDISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hull kurdish community association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ayoub Taib Saadoon | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Yusef Taha Rashid Yasin | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barzo Abdullah | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ahmed Mohammad | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/06/2021 | 05/06/2022 | 05/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.00k | £110.12k | £81.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.00k | £110.12k | £81.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days | |
Annual return | 05 June 2023 | 24 March 2025 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days | |
Annual return | 05 June 2022 | 24 March 2025 | 719 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 775 days | |
Annual return | 05 June 2021 | 24 March 2025 | 1084 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1140 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HULL, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN HULL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 SPRING BANK
HULL
HU3 1AG
- Phone:
- 07727005727
- Email:
- springbank.mosque@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window