Trustees SUTTON ST JAMES BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1184783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Beverley-Stone Trustee 06 March 2025
None on record
Stuart Rose Trustee 07 July 2024
None on record
Annette Rose Trustee 07 July 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Clark Trustee 16 June 2024
None on record
Alastair Chambers Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Linda Andrews Trustee 13 July 2020
None on record