THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, DISLEY WITH ST. JOHN THE DIVINE, FURNESS VALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disley PCC's aim and purpose is promoting in the ecclesiastical parish, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It is also specifically responsible for the care and maintenance of the two churches in Disley Parish - St. Mary the Virgin, Disley and St. John the Divine, Furness Vale and is committed to its Mission Statement to "Share Christ with Others"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,324 from 2 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 October 2019: Standard registration
- DISLEY PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alan Stuart Cornes | Chair | 09 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Barry Stewart Bradley | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Michael Laffey | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Deirdre Serjeant | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Joy Laffey | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Woodhead | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Footitt | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ruth Gateley | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Henry Serjeant | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Howard John Clare | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY BLOWER | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JENIFER SUSAN KIDD | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Wendy Jane Luxon | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christopher Watson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Kidd | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lancaster | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.43k | £100.71k | £91.47k | £121.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.27k | £123.41k | £125.88k | £98.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.40k | £1.40k | £1.70k | £2.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DISLEY VICARAGE
1a Red Lane
Disley
STOCKPORT
SK12 2NP
- Phone:
- 01663635273
- Email:
- ASCORNES@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
disley-parish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window