Financial history THE AMERICAN GARDEN IN PECKHAM

Charity number: 1186914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £33.72k £9.65k £7.66k £141 £2.28k
Total expenditure £16.02k £20.90k £12.76k £9.74k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A