ARFID AWARENESS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARFID Awareness UKs key objectives will be to raise awareness and educate. We will aim to do this by raising awareness about ARFID (Avoidant Restrictive Food Intake Disorder) within the medical profession and wider population. We will aim to do this through poster campaigns, seeking a presence at relevant conferences, organising fundraising events and via social media.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicole Kirkland | Chair | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ailish Harrison | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annemarie Sims | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Cryer | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Raymond | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Fenton | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Harris | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosan Meyer | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.23k | £20.91k | £18.36k | £31.63k | £26.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.90k | £9.02k | £6.18k | £10.37k | £12.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN THE UK, THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED ARISING FROM ILL HEALTH, AMONG THOSE SUFFERING FROM ARFID (AVOIDANT RESTRICTIVE FOOD INTAKE DISORDER) (“THE CONDITION”) IN PARTICULAR BY: A) RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT THE CONDITION WITHIN THE MEDICAL AND ASSOCIATED PROFESSIONS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE; B) PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE TO ENABLE AND EMPOWER PARENTS AND CARERS TO ADVOCATE FOR THE CHILDREN IN THEIR CARE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE CONDITION; C) FUNDING RESEARCH INTO THE CONDITION, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; D) PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED FAMILIES OF SUFFERERS OF THE CONDITION TO OBTAIN NECESSARY TREATMENT AND MEDICATION UNAVAILABLE VIA THE NHS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 BRIDGE STREET
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07944842408
- Email:
- Info@ARFIDAwarenessuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window