Accounts and annual returns PAGABO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1187084
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 December 2024 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 November 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 September 2024 310 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 November 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 November 2022 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 June 2022 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 June 2022 229 days late Download Open in new window