PAGABO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awareness - Raising awareness of Mental Health in the Construction industry Raising the Profile - Improving the awareness and acceptance of the people who work within it. Signposting - Making support and advice as readily available as possible. We shall do this by raising monies through charitable purposes and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 December 2019: CIO registration
- PAGABO FOUNDATION - BUILDING MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Stapley | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hall | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Lunn | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Alice Hartigan | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hardwick-Smith | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morris | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fraser | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Toplass | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Aiston | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £30.00k | £4.92k | £73.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £6.87k | £56.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 November 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2024 | 310 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2022 | 229 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2022 | 229 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY ENABLING AND EMPOWERING INDIVIDUALS IN THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS TO LIVE WITH, MANAGE AND RECOVER FROM THEIR CONDITION, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS ENABLING CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS TO ACCESS MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES; AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY WORKING TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS CAUSED BY WORKING IN THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY OR EXPERIENCED BY INDIVIDUALS WORKING IN THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY BY GATHERING AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION, WORKING TO RAISE AWARENESS, PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING AND CHALLENGE STIGMA AND DISCRIMINATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Whitefriargate
HULL
HU1 2HU
- Phone:
- 01482975883
- Email:
- foundation@pagabo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window