ARCHIE'S ALLERGIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR MISSION IS TO PREVENT AND RAISE AWARENESS OF FOOD ALLERGIES. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO FAMILIES AND INDIVIDUALS LIVING WITH ALLERGIC DISEASE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tricia Morgan | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Murphy | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Murphy | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days | |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 577 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 577 days | |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 942 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 942 days | |
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1307 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF FATAL FOOD ALLERGIES THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, WALES AND NORTHERN IRELAND, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO FAMILIES OR INDIVIDUALS LIVING WITH FATAL FOOD ALLERGIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 WILLOWS AVENUE
CARDIFF
CF24 2ST
- Phone:
- 07377506875
- Email:
- hello@archiesallergies.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window