BIODIVERSITY AND ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION SOCIETY (BEES)

Charity Number: 1187828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Biodiversity and Environmental Education Society (BEES) charity is offering the UK's first comprehensive nature guide training course. The course will be taught outdoors and online covering topics in natural and human sciences. We aim to open broadly to the adult public and minimise cost to participants. It will run initially in Suffolk and Norfolk, with accredited nature guide certification.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £480
Total expenditure: £1,812

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • BEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Anneloes Martinsen Chair 01 June 2019
None on record
Sam Rogers Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
Laura Benstead Trustee 08 February 2023
None on record
Dr Lee Norman Fletcher Trustee 14 July 2020
None on record
David Cammaerts Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.06k £8.39k £253 £480
Total expenditure £1.17k £4.69k £1.60k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 REDSHANK CLOSE
HAVERHILL
CB9 0PB
Phone:
07941674227