THICKSKIN THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We create bold and ambitious theatre; reaching and inspiring young, new and representative audiences across the world through our distinctive physicality and cinematic style. We nurture talent across all areas of theatre-making, providing a springboard for artists who are ready to take a leap.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £180,450 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 February 2020: CIO registration
- THICKSKIN (Working name)
- THICKSKIN PRODUCTIONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inga Hirst | Chair | 09 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Anne Pickering | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yusuf Khamisa | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Porter | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Verity Overs-Morrell | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Eames | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle nicholson | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Toto Matthew William Joseph Ellis | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gurjinder Singh Kang | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Sebastian Danczak | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.85k | £248.25k | £495.99k | £406.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.09k | £225.52k | £534.22k | £392.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £127.59k | £143.10k | £131.50k | £180.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Feb 2020 as amended on 28 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE PERFORMING ARTS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY PRODUCTIONS, EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS AND EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill at the Pier
Trencherfield Mill
Heritage Way
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN3 4BL
- Phone:
- 01942410410
- Email:
- admin@thickskintheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window