Accounts and annual returns TANSLEY COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1185294
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 15 February 2025 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 15 February 2025 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 28 March 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 28 March 2024 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 12 March 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 12 March 2023 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 02 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 02 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 13 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 13 February 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window