THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. OSWALD, ASHBOURNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC exists to promote Christian worship and outreach in the parish of St. Oswald Ashbourne with St. Mary Mappleton within the framework of the Church of England, and the maintenance of the church buildings. Regular religious services are held, with additional activities focused on the provision of pastoral and social care, including the fortnightly 'Ossies Kitchen' community cafe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 September 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Burns | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Anne Clews | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nora Anne Ford | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Alexander Gardner | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Dorothy Haviland Williams | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patricia Ann Short | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie John Elwell | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Celia Anne Dickinson | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Yvonne Herbert | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Margaret Macdonald Rode | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Stewart Rode | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Carl Walker | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Barbour | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Damesin | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roger Marshall Harrison | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Anne Walker | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael Vincent Halls | Trustee | 09 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ELLIOTT | Trustee | 08 March 1999 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.59k | £118.32k | £125.46k | £217.40k | £152.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.42k | £101.10k | £116.43k | £167.71k | £164.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Oswalds Church Hall
School Lane
Ashbourne
DE6 1AN
- Phone:
- 030 300 0498
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window