MILTON KEYNES MODEL RAILWAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For over fifty years Milton Keynes Model Railway Club has been preserving the history of Britain's railways. Today the club is a thriving organisation helping and supporting modellers to develop models that show the British heritage. The trustees work with club members to ensure that models are built to a high standard and provide educational guidance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Egerton | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Byrne | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerhard Novak | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Woodley | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Webb | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL HORNE | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.12k | £6.70k | £18.97k | £21.31k | £15.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.16k | £9.81k | £9.84k | £19.11k | £17.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 August 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 August 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND FOSTER A GENERAL INTEREST IN MODEL RAILWAYS, AND ALLIED INTERESTS AND PURSUITS, AND IN PARTICULAR ENCOURAGE A HIGH STANDARD OF MODELLING AMONGST THE MEMBERS OF THE CLUB.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 North House
Bond Avenue
Bletchley
Milton Keynes
MK1 1SW
- Phone:
- 07547432859
- Email:
- NEPHROID7@GOOGLEMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
mkmrs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window