BUTTERFLY BOOKS FOR BABY LOSS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing books and memorial gifts to offer comfort and support to such families and raising awareness among the general public of baby loss and the effect that it has on grieving parents and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Pickett | Chair | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matt Pickett | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Waller | Trustee | 05 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73k | £3.35k | £2.08k | £1.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.41k | £2.38k | £1.16k | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 05 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF BEREAVED PARENTS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE LOSS OF A BABY DURING PREGNANCY OR SHORTLY AFTER BIRTH IN SUCH WAYS AND BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING BOOKS AND MEMORIAL GIFTS TO OFFER COMFORT AND SUPPORT TO SUCH FAMILIES AND RAISING AWARENESS AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF BABY LOSS AND THE EFFECT THAT IT HAS ON GRIEVING PARENTS AND FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MOSSLEIGH AVENUE
ROWNHAMS
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 8FU
- Phone:
- 02380196441
- Email:
- matthew_pickett@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window