WOLLATON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitating a wide variety of educational, recreational, and social groups for people in their 'Third Age'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 27 August 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Spilsbury | Chair | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Cooper | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cooper | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie Peart | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Manjit Kaur-Jones | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Therese Elizabeth Holmes | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John May | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret May | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marshall | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Conrad Steele-Benny | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allan Kenneth Bridgwater | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Elizabeth Cain Bridgwater | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.94k | £5.27k | £4.43k | £5.12k | £8.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.06k | £3.57k | £4.42k | £4.59k | £7.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 ULLSWATER CRESCENT
BRAMCOTE
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 3BE
- Phone:
- 01159250371
- Email:
- secretary@wollatonu3a.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window