NDS Community Services

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our organisation runs an emergency, a special dietary and distribution food bank in Wolverhampton. We support the underprivileged individuals and families from different social and ethnic backgrounds. We also provide IT Skills training, emotional well-being, complementary therapy treatments and general support services in different languages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 August 2019: CIO registration
- NISHKAM DIVINE SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEEMA RAYAT | Chair | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
SERJU RAMAN PATEL | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
BIMLA DEVI | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SONIA UPPAL | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.12k | £38.55k | £31.93k | £31.23k | £14.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.91k | £41.79k | £28.27k | £36.22k | £17.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Aug 2019 as amended on 14 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN THE UK AND INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saturn Centre
Spring Road
Ettingshall
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV4 6JX
- Phone:
- 07306 013506
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window