THE MILL COMMUNITY HUB, COTTINGHAM AND MIDDLETON

Charity Number: 1185835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To establish or secure the establishment of a community centre and to maintain or manage or co-operate with any statutory authority in the maintenance and management of such a centre for activities promoted by the charity in furtherance of the above objects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £23,063
Total expenditure: £14,711

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Northamptonshire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 2019: CIO registration
  • 20 August 2020: Funds received from 1096744 COTTINGHAM AND MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL TRUST (NORTH...
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE MILL COMMUNITY HUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Hempson-Medwell Chair 13 January 2020
COTTINGHAM MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Alan Samuel Smith Trustee 16 April 2025
None on record
Glynn Lowe Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Leigh Nicole Morrell Trustee 31 March 2022
COTTINGHAM MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Sarah Sian Coughlan Trustee 31 March 2022
COTTINGHAM MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Michael Curtis Trustee 13 January 2020
COTTINGHAM MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
COTTINGHAM MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL
Recently registered
Sarah Brant Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Joanne Leaning Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £51.49k £4.40k £2.59k £13.17k £23.06k
Total expenditure £10.80k £420 £0 £15.09k £14.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17A Church Street
Cottingham
Market Harborough
Leics
LE16 8XG
Phone:
01536770913