Accounts and annual returns HELP INTERNATIONAL WELFARE TRUST UK

Charity Number: 1187856
Charity reporting is up to date (119 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 February 2025 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 February 2025 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window