THE GREAT PLAINS FOUNDATION (UNITED KINGDOM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has been established to protect the wildlife of the African plains by making grants to support conservation efforts, educate the public and provide local communities with alternative and sustainable sources of funding (as opposed to funding from poaching activities).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Botswana
- Kenya
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 April 2020: Standard registration
- GREAT PLAINS FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverly Joubert | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Alaistair George Murray | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND WILDLIFE AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES IN AFRICA, INCLUDING THE PROTECTION OF SPECIES SUCH AS RHINOS, ELEPHANTS, AND BIG CATS AS WELL AS THEIR HABITATS; (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN AFRICA, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE FURTHERANCE AND/OR IMPLEMENTATION OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES; (III) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION IN RURAL AREAS IN AFRICA; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO CONSERVATION INCLUDING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; AND (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS 'DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
THIRD FLOOR
20 OLD BAILEY
LONDON
EC4M 7AN
- Phone:
- +2025506222
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window