NORTHFLEET CENTRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes Grants To Organisations, Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space, Provides Services, Provides Advocacy/advice/information, Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 12 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Stamp | Chair | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neege Nigel Geoffrey Allen | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abisola Oshoteku | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Reece Watts | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jagjit Kaur Klair | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Jackova | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lauren Sullivan | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.95k | £5.02k | £12.43k | £71 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.02k | £12.84k | £20.27k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.95k | £5.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTHFLEET, KENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF NORTHFLEET IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brendan P Byrne & Co Ltd
12 Old Bexley Lane
BEXLEY
Kent
DA5 2BN
- Phone:
- 07432858794
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window