FRIENDS OF THE WILLIAMSON ART GALLERY AND WIRRAL MUSEUMS

Charity number: 514641
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support of Wirral Museums Service, contributing towards purchases, exhibitions, publications and events. Operation of concert series using Wirral Museums venues.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016

Total income: £17,872
Total expenditure: £22,239

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1983: Standard registration
  • 20 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 20 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1166363 WILLIAMSON AND PRIORY FRIENDS
  • 12 July 2024: Funds received from 701518 HOYLAKE HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOWAGAM (Working name)
  • FRIENDS OF THE WILLIAMSON ART GALLERY AND MUSEUM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016
Total gross income £10.48k £10.34k £33.13k £25.11k £17.87k
Total expenditure £5.45k £11.00k £14.54k £18.97k £22.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2016 01 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 28 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 28 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2014 13 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 13 August 2015 On Time