Accounts and annual returns MY FIRST FRIENDS NURSERY

Charity number: 1185986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 21 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 February 2025 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 February 2025 113 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 February 2025 479 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 January 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 January 2023 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 January 2023 441 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 January 2023 441 days late Download Open in new window