GOOD NEIGHBOURS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Good Neighbours UK (GNUK) fundraises and manages projects locally, nationally and internationally to ensure vulnerable people can exercise their human rights no matter where they live. It is an independent, self-governing organisation that affiliates with Good Neighbours International (GN). Through this affiliation, GNUK becomes part of the world alliance of Good Neighbours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,628 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Chad
- Chile
- Dominican Republic
- El Salvador
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Malawi
- Mongolia
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Pakistan
- Paraguay
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 21 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven John Langdon | Chair | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rita Sarkar | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Waithera Njiri | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Ian Robert McLean | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew William Knight | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jon Joonbum Park | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN FOY | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ha Eun Seong | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.99k | £201.26k | £623.90k | £298.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.11k | £163.49k | £537.74k | £278.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.63k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £623.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £537.74k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £11.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO: PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY BY WAY OF, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVIDING EDUCATION AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES FOR THE BENEFIT AND PROTECTION OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN CHARITABLE NEED; PROVIDE RELIEF FOR PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priory Street Centre
17 Priory Street
York
YO1 6ET
- Phone:
- 0808 196 8088
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window