Financial history SHREE RAM MANDIR (WALSALL)

Charity number: 514652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.54k £21.19k £45.46k £55.20k £61.60k
Total expenditure £58.09k £42.37k £44.23k £55.43k £61.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A