Accounts and annual returns EMMANUEL REFORMATION FELLOWSHIP CHURCH (UK)
Charity number: 1186002

Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 January 2023 | 435 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window