EMMANUEL REFORMATION FELLOWSHIP CHURCH (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEACHING BIBLES, GIVE ADVISES TO MEMBERS WHO SEEKS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 25 October 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andinet Lemma Hailu | Chair | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lidya Bedlu Teklemariam | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Berhane Aseged | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.06k | £23.61k | £19.30k | £24.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.23k | £22.99k | £18.68k | £23.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 January 2023 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 January 2023 | 435 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UK AND ABROAD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING RELIGIOUS SERVICES, PASTORAL CARE, MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27A RYE HILL PARK
LONDON
SE15 3JN
- Phone:
- 07446992977
- Email:
- ANDULIDU2019@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window