NORTH EAST STEM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants for STEM related education across the North East of England, in particular advancing the education of students of UTC South Durham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 09 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tania Cooper | Chair | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Meldrum | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jackson Hogg | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Calverley Dower | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Land | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.83k | £81.37k | £75.08k | £119.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.30k | £61.54k | £57.93k | £70.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jan 2020 as amended on 03 Dec 2024 as amended on 10 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): * YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND; AND * STUDENTS ENROLLED AT UTC?S IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) IN RELATION TO SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHEMATICS (STEM) EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
U T C SOUTH DURHAM
LONG TENS WAY
AYCLIFFE BUSINESS PARK
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 6AP
- Phone:
- 01325430250
- Email:
- admin@nesf.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window