Accounts and annual returns BETHEL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 514666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 August 2024 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 30 August 2024 207 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required