CAMROSE AND ROCH PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sessional childcare for children 2-4 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,771 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 16 October 2019: CIO registration
- 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1038693 CAMROSE AND ROCH PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Davis | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Alice Davies | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Neumann | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.55k | £53.31k | £57.20k | £45.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.55k | £39.80k | £48.03k | £54.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.03k | £34.28k | £10.77k | £10.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OPF CHILDREN IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY CHILDCARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Camrose & Roch Playgroup
Camrose Community Centre
HAVERFORDWEST
Pembrokeshire
SA62 6AA
- Phone:
- 01437710872
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window