LLANRHAEADR AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise a local village show on an annual basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Powys
Governance
- 03 December 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET MORRIS | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIA TURNER | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £0 | £0 | £2.03k | £2.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87k | £0 | £0 | £1.42k | £2.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 OCTOBER 1949 AS AMENDED 30TH OCTOBER 1984.
Charitable objects
FOR THEENCOURAGEMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND FOR PROMOTING THE GENERAL GOOD OF THE SAME PARTICULARLY IN LLANRHAEADR & DISTRICT, INSOFAR AS SUCH OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
LLANRHAEADR AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PLAS NEWYDD
LLANRHAEADR YM MOCHNANT
OSWESTRY
SY10 0EB
- Phone:
- 01691780343
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window