COMBEPOSTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Combeposters runs a green waste recycling scheme in Combe Martin, North Devon. We collect green garden waste from local residents and produce compost and related products. The products are distributed back into the local community. We recruit and train volunteers to operate the scheme. We use income generated by the scheme to fund local community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 06 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Rosvall | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Smith | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Ann Bennett | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Valerie Byne-Grey | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/04/2021 | 10/04/2022 | 10/04/2023 | 10/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13k | £801 | £386 | £6.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £3.07k | £1.06k | £61.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £614 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 April 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 207 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 April 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 April 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN COMBE MARTIN, NORTH DEVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING AND ORGANISING FACILITIES FOR COMPOSTING DOMESTIC (NONCOMMERCIAL) GARDEN, COMPOSTABLE VEGETATIVE MATERIAL AND REDISTRIBUTION
Contact information
- Address:
-
5
Spurway Gardens
Combe Martin
North Devon
EX34 0PL
- Phone:
- 01271889034
- Email:
- desmottram@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window