BEHATI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide quality education to poor children from rural parts of The Gambia by investing in various projects, from providing school learning materials to food and safe water as part of our efforts to help vulnerable children and their families lift themselves out of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 February 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- The Gambia
Governance
- 12 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Magdalena Strozik | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Boguta | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Baker | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/02/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £634 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 11 February 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 February 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT SCHOOLS IN THE NIANIJA DISTRICT IN THE GAMBIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: Ø SUPPORTING THE DAY TO DAY RUNNING OF THE SCHOOLS; Ø IMPROVING BUILDINGS AND INFRASTRUCTURE AT THE SCHOOLS; IMPROVING FACILITIES FOR LEARNING AND RECREATION WITHIN THE SCHOOLS; Ø PROVIDING LEARNING RESOURCES AND SCHOOL SUPPLIES, SUCH AS TEXT BOOKS AND STATIONERY; Ø PROVIDING ESSENTIAL FACILITIES WITHIN THE SCHOOLS, SUCH AS SAFE DRINKING WATER, HAND WASHING STATIONS AND TOILETS; Ø INCREASING THE SCHOOLS’ TEACHING RESOURCES AND ASSISTING IN IMPROVING THE STANDARDS OF TEACHING WITHIN THE SCHOOLS BY SUPPORTING THE TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF TEACHERS; Ø AWARDING EDUCATIONAL SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE NIANIJA DISTRICT IN THE GAMBIA BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. 3) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE NIANIJA DISTRICT IN THE GAMBIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL HEALTH WORKSHOPS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 KIRKWOOD CLOSE
CHESTER
CH3 5JX
- Phone:
- 07808839103
- Email:
- magda@behatifoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window