Accounts and annual returns LEEDS PARISH CHURCH APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 514687
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2005 11 July 2006 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not submitted