TEES VALLEY COMMUNITY CARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
N/A
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 24 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zahida Parveen Rashid | Chair | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sabina Sarwar | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nusrat Naseem Razzaq | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaneen Kausar Yaqoob | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adnan Adeel Rashid | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rifaat Shamim Raja | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Mahrrof Hussain | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaufkath Rashid | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arshad Begum Hussain | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kubra Aziz | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.05k | £192.24k | £78.01k | £80.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.44k | £29.33k | £39.19k | £56.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £905 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2022 | 228 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2022 | 228 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN PAKISTAN, BY FACILITATING PROJECTS TO DELIVER SAFE WATER, HYGIENE AND SANITATION TO THOSE IN NEED. 2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 50 AND PEOPLE OF ANY AGE WITH PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL DISABILITIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, AND WHO RESIDE IN TEES VALLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE CENTRE FACILITIES WITH AIM OF COMBATTING SOCIAL ISOLATION. 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG HOMELESS PEOPLE IN TEES VALLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE FOOD AND OTHER NECESSITIES WHICH THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO AFFORD. 4) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND AND PAKISTAN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HEALTH AWARENESS CLASSES AND COURSES ON SUBJECTS SUCH AS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE IMPORTANCE OF CLEAN WATER AND GOOD HYGIENE, RISK OF DISEASE AND PREVENTATIVE LIFESTYLE CHOICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ironopolis Halls
Bright Street
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS1 2AG
- Phone:
- 01642506105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window